Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Biasin

Bishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1943 Born Arzercavalli, Italy
20 Apr 196824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Jul 200359.9AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Oct 200360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
8 Jun 201167.8AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Aug 201168.0InstalledBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francesco Biasin:
Bishop Francesco Biasin (born ) Bishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 30 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013