Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Corumbá

Dioecesis Corumbensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 March 1910
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Campo Grande
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 62,890 (24,291 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste I
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Antonio Maria Coelho 1000, C.P. 12, 79301-002 Corumba, MS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (067)3231-4416
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 March 1910ErectedDiocese of Cuiabá Diocese of Corumbá (erected)
15 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Corumbá
Territorial Prelature of Registro do Araguaia
Diocese of Campo Grande (erected)
15 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Corumbá Diocese of Dourados (erected)
30 January 1981Territory LostDiocese of Corumbá Diocese of Jardim (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950400,000420,00095.2%83834,81911811921ap1951
1966220,000228,00096.5%323268,461266614ap1967
1970250,000.0%220220246912ap1971
1976250,000270,00092.6%4182211,363245014ap1977
1980269,000301,00089.4%526318,677305713ap1981
199090,000120,00075.0%29118,18110255ap1991
199976,415101,88775.0%47116,9468165ap2000
200076,622102,16375.0%39126,38510165ap2001
200185,000100,30084.7%19108,50011125ap2002
200285,000102,68082.8%68146,071110146ap2003
200385,000102,68082.8%68146,07110135ap2004
200485,000102,68082.8%310136,53812115ap2005
200687,100105,30082.7%48127,258213135ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Jun 2014