Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Helvécio Gomes de Oliveira, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1876BornAnchieta
9 Jun 190125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Feb 191841.9AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
18 Jun 191842.3AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
15 Aug 191842.4Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
10 Feb 192245.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Feb 192245.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Verissa
10 Nov 192246.7SucceededArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Apr 196084.1DiedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Helvécio Gomes de Oliveira:
Archbishop Helvécio Gomes de Oliveira S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Mariana

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015