Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José d’Angelo Neto

Deceased

Archbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1917BornIbituruna
1 Dec 194023.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 196042.4AppointedBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
26 May 196042.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
14 Apr 196244.5AppointedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
198264.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
198466.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
31 May 199072.6DiedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José d’Angelo Neto:
Archbishop José d’Angelo Neto (born , died ) Archbishop of Pouso Alegre

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013