Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre

Archidioecesis Pouso Alegre



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 April 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 12,620 (4,874 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Web Site: http://arquidiocesepa.cjb.net/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 122, Trav. Dr. Silvio Fausto 33, 37550-000 Pouso Alegre, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (035) 421-1248
  • Fax: 421-1741

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Pouso Alegre
4 August 1900ErectedDiocese of Mariana Diocese of Pouso Alegre (erected)
3 February 1916Territory LostDiocese of Pouso Alegre Diocese of Guaxupé (erected)
Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre
14 April 1962ElevatedDiocese of Pouso Alegre Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pouso Alegre
1950529,445534,44599.1%3717549,8042217534ap1951
Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre
1965402,000412,72697.4%4846944,2765530640ap1967
1968439,200462,20095.0%4543884,9906032931ap1971
1976450,000480,00093.8%4032726,2503924340ap1977
1980494,000546,00090.5%3932716,9574526943ap1981
1990520,000565,00092.0%5622786,6662320846ap1991
1999583,318708,34182.3%6723906,4814721451ap2000
2000583,318645,00090.4%75291045,6083621351ap2001
2001583,318653,37889.3%7125966,0763218651ap2002
2002588,040653,37890.0%8217995,9394169451ap2003
2003644,841715,17990.2%6820887,3274619251ap2004
2004660,580730,91890.4%7120917,2594519153ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 6 Mar 2014