Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio de Almeida Moraes Junior

Deceased

Archbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1904BornSapucaí Mirim
2 Oct 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 194844.2AppointedBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
12 Dec 194844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
31 Jan 194944.5InstalledBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
17 Nov 195147.3AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
19 Mar 195247.7InstalledArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
23 Apr 196055.8AppointedArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
21 Aug 196056.1InstalledArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Apr 197974.8RetiredArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Nov 198480.3DiedArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Almeida Moraes Junior:
Archbishop Antônio de Almeida Moraes Junior (born , died ) Archbishop of Niterói

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015