Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Niterói

Archidioecesis Nictheroyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Francisco Rezende Dias, Archbishop
  • Geraldo de Paula Souza, C.SS.R., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alano Maria Pena, O.P., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1960
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio de Janeiro
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 4,728 (1,826 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste 1
  • Official Web Site: https://arqnit.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Rua Gaviao Peixoto 250, 24230-103 Niteroi, RJ, Brazil
  • Telephone: (021)3602-1700

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
27 April 1892ErectedDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (erected)
15 November 1895Territory LostDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Diocese of Espírito Santo (erected)
Diocese of Petrópolis
16 July 1897Name ChangedDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Diocese of Petrópolis
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
25 February 1908Name ChangedDiocese of Petrópolis Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
4 December 1922Territory LostDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Diocese of Barra do Piraí (erected)
4 December 1922Territory LostDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Diocese of Campos (erected)
27 March 1925Territory LostDiocese of Barra do Piraí (Besengano, Conservatória, Encruzilhada, Ipiabas, Miguel Pereira, Paraíba do Sul, Paty do Alferes, Rio Bonito, Rio das Flores, Sapucaia, Três Rios, Valença, and Vassouras)
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (Carmo and Sumidouro)
Diocese of Valença (erected)
13 April 1946Territory LostDiocese of Barra do Piraí (Duque de Caxias and São João de Meriti)
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (Petrópolis, Teresópolis, São José do Vale do Rio Preto, Magé, Guapimirim, part of Três Rios (Bemposta), and part of Paraíba do Sul (Parish of Inconfidência))
Diocese of Petrópolis (erected)
26 March 1960Territory LostDiocese of Campos (Casimiro de Abreu, Conceição de Macabu, Macaé, Santa Maria Madalena, São Sebastião do Alto, Trajano de Moráis, and parts of Cordeiro)
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (Bom Jardim, Cachoeiras de Macacu, Cantagalo, Duas Barras, Itaocara, Nova Friburgo, and parts of Cordeiro)
Diocese of Valença (Carmo and Sumidouro)
Diocese of Nova Friburgo (erected)
Archdiocese of Niterói
26 March 1960ElevatedDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Archdiocese of Niterói

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Niterói
1966854,080954,08089.5%69371068,057428133ap1967
1970970,000979,08099.1%54369010,7774820842ap1971
19761,080,0201,233,02087.6%54328612,5583727347ap1977
19801,418,0001,546,00091.7%55419614,7705519053ap1981
19901,803,0001,963,00091.8%546011415,8157622757ap1991
19991,639,7791,906,73086.0%624610815,1836122257ap2000
20001,639,7791,906,73086.0%674511214,6406021657ap2001
20011,798,1752,090,90286.0%664611216,055176021157ap2002
20021,798,1752,094,28885.9%674210916,497175620758ap2003
20031,798,1752,094,28885.9%584210017,981175520758ap2004
20041,277,5162,094,28861.0%694111011,613175519558ap2005
20131,218,0002,265,00053.8%100471478,285635520276ap2014
20161,249,0002,322,00053.8%113391528,217804519178ap2017
20191,279,1702,378,05053.8%109321419,072903717978ap2020
20211,353,2702,515,80053.8%103381419,597894318378ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Niterói
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 52, Page 876, to Page 879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 2 Jun 2024