Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Eduardo de Sabóia Bandeira Melo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Palmas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1902BornPetrópolis
4 Jan 192522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Dec 194745.4AppointedPrelate of Palmas, Brazil
13 Dec 194745.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
14 Mar 194845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
11 Apr 195855.8AppointedBishop of Palmas, Brazil
7 Feb 196966.6DiedBishop of Palmas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Eduardo de Sabóia Bandeira Melo:
Bishop Carlos Eduardo de Sabóia Bandeira Melo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Palmas

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013