Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Reis

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1885Born
30 Nov 191025.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 193145.7AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Dec 193146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Jan 193246.2InstalledBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 Sep 196074.8DiedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Reis
Bishop Antônio Reis (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Maria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz do Sul

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018