Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Cláudio Colling

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1913BornHarmonia
10 Aug 193724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 194936.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 194936.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Corone
29 Jan 195036.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corone
23 Mar 195137.7AppointedBishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 Aug 198168.2AppointedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Jul 199178.1RetiredArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Sep 199279.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Cláudio Colling:
Archbishop João Cláudio Colling (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013