Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thadeu Gomes Canellas

Bishop Emeritus of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1930 Born
25 Feb 195625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 Nov 198353.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 Nov 198353.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
25 Feb 198453.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
10 Nov 199969.2AppointedBishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Nov 200676.2RetiredBishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Thadeu Gomes Canellas
Bishop Thadeu Gomes Canellas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Osório

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravatai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osório.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2018