Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmundo Luís Kunz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1919BornVenâncio Aires
30 Nov 194425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Aug 195536.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Aug 195536.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
30 Oct 195536.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
12 Sep 198869.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edmundo Luís Kunz:
Bishop Edmundo Luís Kunz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015