Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Frederico Etges

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1910BornSanta Cruz do Sul
20 Apr 193524.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 195949.0AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Oct 195949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jun 198675.9RetiredBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Jan 199685.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto Frederico Etges:
Bishop Alberto Frederico Etges (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz do Sul

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015