Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Willy Kist, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Diamantino, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1925Born
16 Dec 195631.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Nov 198256.9AppointedBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
11 Feb 198357.2Ordained BishopBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
26 Aug 199872.7RetiredBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Feb 200276.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Willy Kist:
Bishop Agostinho Willy Kist S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Diamantino

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013