Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfredo Vicente Cardinal Scherer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora de La Salette


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1903Born
3 Apr 192623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Jun 194643.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Jun 194643.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
30 Dec 194643.9AppointedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
23 Feb 194744.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Apr 196966.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196966.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora de La Salette
29 Aug 198178.5RetiredArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Mar 199693.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Vicente Scherer
Alfredo Vicente Cardinal Scherer (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Princípio

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
  • a cardinal for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 6
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 585, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 852, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,015, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Aug 2020

Quantcast