Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adélio Giuseppe (José) Tomasin, P.S.D.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1930 Born
17 Oct 195121.4ProfessedMember of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
26 Mar 195524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
16 Mar 198857.8AppointedBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
26 Mar 198857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
3 Jan 200776.6RetiredBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adélio Giuseppe (José) Tomasin
Bishop Adélio Giuseppe (José) Tomasin P.S.D.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quixadá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontegaldella

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quixadá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018