Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dadeus Grings

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1936 BornPorto Alegre
23 Dec 196125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
23 Jan 199154.4AppointedBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Mar 199154.5Ordained BishopBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Apr 200063.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Feb 200164.4SucceededArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Sep 201377.0RetiredArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Dadeus Grings:
Archbishop Dadeus Grings (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,633
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014