Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neri José Tondello

Bishop of Juína, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1964 BornAntônio Prado
18 Apr 199329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 200844.6AppointedBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil
11 Jan 200944.8Ordained BishopBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Feb 200944.9InstalledBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Neri José Tondello:
Bishop Neri José Tondello (born ) Bishop of Juína

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juína.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2008
  • ob/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014