Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mílton Antônio dos Santos, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1946 BornCampos do Jordão
22 Dec 197428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 May 200053.7AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
20 Aug 200053.9Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 Sep 200053.9InstalledBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Jun 200356.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
9 Jun 200457.7SucceededArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
2 Aug 200760.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil
12 Nov 200862.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mílton Antônio dos Santos:
Archbishop Mílton Antônio dos Santos S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Cuiabá

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cuiabá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013