Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Campo Grande

Archidioecesis Campi Grandis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dimas Lara Barbosa, Archbishop
  • Eduardo Pinheiro da Silva, S.D.B., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Vitório Pavanello, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 27 November 1978
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 44,981 (17,373 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste 1
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metopolitana, Rua Amando de Oliveira 448, B. Amambai, 79008-010 Campo Grande, MS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (067)3317-4950
  • Fax: 3317-4955

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Campo Grande
15 June 1957ErectedDiocese of Corumbá
Territorial Prelature of Registro do Araguaia
Diocese of Campo Grande (erected)
3 January 1978Territory LostDiocese of Campo Grande Diocese of Três Lagoas (erected)
3 January 1978Territory LostDiocese of Campo Grande Territorial Prelature of Coxim (erected)
Archdiocese of Campo Grande
27 November 1978ElevatedDiocese of Campo Grande Archdiocese of Campo Grande

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Campo Grande
1959158,954.0%15253010311416ap1960
1966234,000306,00076.5%263653,60011015518ap1967
1968274,000343,00079.9%264664,1517915016ap1971
1976406,384507,98080.0%670765,34759716130ap1977
Archdiocese of Campo Grande
1980296,000370,00080.0%348515,8036812013ap1981
1990394,000484,00081.4%1531821,8887317221ap1991
1999550,000700,00078.6%2850787,05110012730ap2000
2000550,000700,00078.6%3456906,11110916830ap2001
2001550,000730,00075.3%3064945,85112016831ap2002
2002550,000730,00075.3%3660965,72911315833ap2003
2003550,000730,00075.3%2767945,85111416033ap2004
20041,634,6962,169,68875.3%317010116,18512318633ap2005
20061,673,0002,222,00075.3%307010016,730212518633ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011