Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation for Bishops

Congregatio pro Episcopis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marc Ouellet, P.S.S., Cardinal, Prefect
  • Ilson de Jesus Montanari, Secretary
  • Giovanni Battista Re, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Congregation
  • Name Changed: 1 August 1967
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: examines what pertains to the establishment and provision of particular Churches and to the exercise of the episcopal office in the Latin Church, without prejudice to the competence of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples. (Pastor Bonus, 75)
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/congregations/cbishops/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo della Congregazioni, 00193 Roma, Piazza Pio XII, 10
  • Telephone: 06.69.88.42.17
  • Fax: 06.69.88.53.03

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Sacred Consistorial Congregation
22 January 1588ErectedSacred Consistorial Congregation (erected)
Congregation for Bishops
1 August 1967Name ChangedSacred Consistorial Congregation Congregation for Bishops
28 June 1988Territory LostPontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
Congregation for Bishops
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.5, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 May 2016