Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Baldisseri

Secretary General of the Synod of Bishops

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1940 BornBarga
29 Jun 196322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
15 Jan 199251.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Diocletiana
15 Jan 199251.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
7 Mar 199251.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Diocletiana
6 Apr 199554.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
19 Jun 199958.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to India
23 Jun 199958.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nepal
12 Nov 200262.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
11 Jan 201271.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
7 Mar 201271.4AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
21 Sep 201373.0AppointedSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
28 Jan 201473.3ResignedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
22 Feb 201473.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino
22 Feb 201473.4Elevated to Cardinal
11 May 201473.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Baldisseri:
Lorenzo Cardinal Baldisseri (born ) Secretary General of Synod of Bishops

Please contact the Cardinal through the Synod of Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,764
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cd: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 7 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 23 Oct 2014