Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Moreira da Silva

Bishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1953 Born
17 Jan 198228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
12 Nov 200855.4AppointedBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Jan 200955.6Ordained BishopBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Moreira da Silva
Bishop José Moreira da Silva (born ) Bishop of Januária

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonte Alta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Januária.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,045

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018