Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Percival Joseph Fernandez

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

Titular Bishop of Bulla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1935 Born
21 Dec 196025.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 200165.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
13 Mar 200165.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla
21 Apr 200165.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla
4 Jan 201175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Percival Joseph Fernandez
Bishop Percival Joseph Fernandez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore
Ordained BishopDon Bosco High School, Matunga, Archdiocese of Bombay

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,962
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018