Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mangalore

Dioecesis Mangalorensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangalore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 5,924 (2,288 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Kodialbail, Mangalore-575003, Dakshina Kannada, India
  • Telephone: (0824)440.524/5
  • Fax: 444.035

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 September 1886ErectedDiocese of Mangalore (erected)
12 June 1923Territory LostDiocese of Coimbatore
Diocese of Mangalore
Diocese of Mysore
Diocese of Calicut (erected)
16 July 2012Territory LostDiocese of Mangalore Diocese of Udupi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950169,3711,986,1108.5%175442197737455182ap1951
1970216,0842,069,03210.4%2005725784092948120ap1971
1980248,9502,308,12210.8%206672739111051,239127ap1981
1990309,0452,777,91011.1%230893199681151,375133ap1991
1999357,2803,967,3609.0%257863431,0411041,575145ap2000
2000360,8534,044,7078.9%249853341,0801001,595147ap2001
2001364,4624,125,6018.8%255903451,0561051,615149ap2002
2002368,1104,208,1138.7%2521113631,0141321,785150ap2003
2003350,0003,879,4829.0%275863619691121,632150ap2004
2004350,0003,957,0718.8%2871194068621421,633154ap2005
2012267,3432,978,5609.0%275137412648101,489112bul:16Jul2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014