Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo de St. Louis Mellano, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verapoly, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1826Born
28 Nov 184216.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
23 Sep 184822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
5 Jul 186842.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
5 Jul 186842.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
5 Sep 186842.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
15 Nov 186842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
14 Jun 187044.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
24 Mar 187650.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mangalore, India
25 Nov 188660.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Leonardo de St. Louis Mellano (VIAF: 55017367)
Archbishop Leonardo de St. Louis Mellano O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrucco, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy, Italy
Ordained BishopVerapoly, Vicariate Apostolic of Verapoly

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 412, and Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017