Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles-Auguste Hébert, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1763Born
8 Jul 180642.5AppointedCoadjutor Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
8 Jul 180642.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
3 Mar 181147.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
30 Oct 181147.8SucceededSuperior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
8 Jul 183672.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
3 Oct 183672.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles-Auguste Hébert
Bishop Louis-Charles-Auguste Hébert M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilledieu-les-Bailleuls, France

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,811, Number 4
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 723, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast