Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Manuel Dávila y Cárdenas

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1678³BornMombeltrán
6 Aug 173153.3AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
30 Sep 173153.5Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
19 Dec 173860.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
25 Jun 174264.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manuel Dávila y Cárdenas:
Bishop Pedro Manuel Dávila y Cárdenas (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,625
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 50, Number 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144, and Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015