Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de La Fuente Yepes

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702¹Born
8 Apr 175351.2SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
28 May 175351.4ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
24 Aug 175553.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1757¹55.0DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de La Fuente Yepes
Bishop Juan de La Fuente Yepes (born 1702, died 1757) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila, Archdiocese of Manila
Ordained BishopJesuit Church, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila
Death PlaceBinmaley

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast