Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Brigot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1713BornSully-sur-Loire, France
22 Jan 175541.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
22 Jan 175541.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
8 Dec 175542.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
24 Aug 175744.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
30 Sep 177663.1AppointedSuperior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
8 Nov 179178.2DiedSuperior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India

MicroData Summary for Pierre Brigot:
Bishop Pierre Brigot M.E.P. (born , died ) Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry

  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 398, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014