Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Percoto, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1729BornUdine, Italy
9 Nov 174718.3ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
Jun 1752³22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
8 Nov 176536.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
8 Nov 176536.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
31 Jan 176838.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
12 Dec 177647.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Percoto:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Percoto B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1768, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 12 Dec 2015