Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of México

Archidioecesis Mexicanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Norberto Rivera Carrera, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Carlos Briseño Arch, O.A.R., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Adolfo Miguel Castaño Fonseca, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Florencio Armando Colin Cruz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rogelio Esquivel Medina, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jorge Estrada Solórzano, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jesús Antonio Lerma Nolasco, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Crispin Ojeda Márquez, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Antonio Ortega Franco, C.O., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Andrés Vargas Peña, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Abelardo Alvarado Alcántara, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • José Luis Fletes Santana, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Francisco Clavel Gil, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Felipe Tejeda García, M.Sp.S., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 February 1546
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Federal District
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 1,479 (571 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Metropolitana
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadomexico.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado Postal 24-433, Durango 90, Col. Roma, 06700 México, D.F., México
  • Telephone: (5)208-3200
  • Fax: 208-2894

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of México
2 September 1530ErectedDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) Diocese of México (erected)
11 August 1536Territory LostDiocese of México Diocese of Michoacán (erected)
Archdiocese of México
12 February 1546ElevatedDiocese of México Archdiocese of México
26 January 1863Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Querétaro (erected)
26 January 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of México Diocese of Tulancingo (erected)
16 March 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Chilapa (erected)
12 March 1870Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas (erected)
20 January 1874Territory LostArchdiocese of México Vicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore (erected)
23 June 1891Territory LostArchdiocese of México Diocese of Cuernavaca (erected)
4 June 1950Territory LostArchdiocese of México Diocese of Toluca (erected)
23 May 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla
Diocese of Tlaxcala (erected)
30 April 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of México Diocese of Texcoco (erected)
27 February 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Tulancingo
Diocese of Tula (erected)
13 January 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Texcoco
Diocese of Tlalnepantla (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of México
19503,500,6404,000,00087.5%3152805955,8832902,146264ap1951
19655,750,0006,155,00093.4%2906789685,9409025,945174ap1967
19686,300,0006,710,00093.9%5928691,4614,3121,0935,945213ap1971
19768,494,1688,802,24796.5%5931,0311,6245,23021,5335,983279ap1977
19809,454,10510,057,55894.0%5981,0501,6485,73611,4766,200320ap1981
199017,580,00018,700,00094.0%5219081,42912,302102,0864,694360ap1991
19997,385,6558,689,00785.0%7139881,7014,341672,4684,875410ap2000
20009,271,52710,910,24585.0%7259451,6705,551742,4915,800420ap2001
20017,283,7128,591,30684.8%7126351,3475,407771,6304,251425ap2002
20026,999,4027,738,30790.5%6986351,3335,250811,6434,744426ap2003
20036,999,4027,380,68794.8%7001,0351,7354,034762,1354,756424ap2004
20046,999,4028,605,23981.3%6511,0351,6864,151951,9604,733431ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014