Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador González Morales

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Lacubaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1971 Born
16 Jun 200129.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of México, Federal District
18 May 200230.4Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
16 Feb 201947.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
16 Feb 201947.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
25 Mar 201947.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza

MicroData Summary for Salvador González Morales
Bishop Salvador González Morales (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained DeaconNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained PriestNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019
  • od/c01/loc: CB, 16 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 27 Mar 2019

Quantcast