Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Sariñana y Medina Cuenca

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1631BornMéxico
27 Sep 168352.3AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Aug 168453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
10 Nov 169665.4DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Sariñana y Medina Cuenca:
Bishop Isidoro Sariñana y Medina Cuenca (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,637
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015