Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Payo Afán Enríquez de Ribera Manrique de Lara, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1613BornSevilla, Spain
9 Jul 165744.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
Sep 1658³45.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
16 Jan 166854.8AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
17 Sep 166855.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
27 Jun 167057.2InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
30 Jun 168168.2ResignedArchbishop of México, Federal District
8 Apr 168471.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Payo Afán Enríquez de Ribera Manrique de Lara:
Archbishop Payo Afán Enríquez de Ribera Manrique de Lara O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of México

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 241, and Page 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 236
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 189, Number 1,183
  • bd: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014