Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso de Briceño (Brizeño), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587²Born
Feb 1606³19.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jul 164457.5SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
14 Nov 164457.8ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
12 Nov 164558.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
Dec 164558.9InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
18 Aug 165366.6AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
16 Nov 166881.8DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso de Briceño (Brizeño) (VIAF: 87714864)
Bishop Alonso de Briceño (Brizeño) O.F.M. (born 1587, died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Chile

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363, and Page 258
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 46
  • prof: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017