Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando de Ramírez y Sánchez, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornArroyo, Spain
1 Jun 164161.4SelectedBishop of Panamá
16 Sep 164161.7ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
9 Feb 164262.1Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
8 Sep 164363.6InstalledBishop of Panamá
11 Apr 165272.2DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hernando de Ramírez y Sánchez:
Bishop Hernando de Ramírez y Sánchez O.SS.T. (died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 272
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 171, Number 1,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015