Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Castejón Fonseca

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580²BornMadrid
9 Jan 163454.0AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
2 Jul 163454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
1 May 163656.3ResignedBishop of Lugo, Spain
23 May 164464.4AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
19 Feb 165575.1DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Castejón Fonseca:
Bishop Diego Castejón Fonseca (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 6 Jan 2014