Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Alonso y Ocón

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1597BornVilla de Ocón, Spain
14 Jun 163841.2AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
16 May 163942.1InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
3 Nov 164245.6SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
31 Aug 164346.4ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
2 Apr 165154.0SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
17 Jul 165154.3ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
12 Oct 165659.5DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Juan Alonso y Ocón:
Archbishop Juan Alonso y Ocón (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 165, Number 1,038
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015