Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Coello Ribera y Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1607Born
11 Apr 163931.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
16 Oct 163931.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
11 Dec 165244.9AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1655¹47.0DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Coello Ribera y Sandoval
Bishop Juan Coello Ribera y Sandoval (born , died 1655) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillarejo de la Peñuela

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,851
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 167, Number 1,046
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast