Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo de Izaguirre de los Reyes

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jul 1654SelectedBishop of Panamá
21 Apr 1655ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
12 Jan 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
31 Jul 1662AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
20 Apr 1669SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
15 Jul 1669ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
16 Mar 1670DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Izaguirre de los Reyes:
Archbishop Bernardo de Izaguirre de los Reyes (died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 189, Number 1,190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 171, and Page 272
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013