Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

Archidioecesis Antequerensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 June 1891
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Oaxaca
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 34,000 (13,132 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Pacífico-Sur
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquioax.org/
  • Mailing Address: Leona Vicario 109, Plazuela del Carmen Alto, Centro, 68000 Oaxaca de Juarez, Oax., Mexico
  • Telephone: (951)516.5580; 516.4822

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
21 June 1535ErectedDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (erected)
19 March 1539Territory LostDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca Diocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (From Seville (Spain) to Mexico (Mexico))
19 March 1863Territory LostDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa (erected)
23 June 1891Territory LostDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca Diocese of Tehuantepec (erected)
Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
23 June 1891ElevatedDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
25 April 1902Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Mixtecas (erected)
24 April 1925Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (Acatlàn) Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
23 May 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (Yautepec, Mixes, and Choápa) Diocese of Tehuantepec
13 January 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (District of Tehuacan)
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles (Talcotepec (Santa Cruz), Atexcal (San Martin), Yehuaìtepec, Xochitlan (Todos Santos), Coyotepec (San Vicente), Ixcaquixtla (San Juan Bautista), Atenayuca (Juan N. Méndez), Cañada Morelos, and Palmar de Bravo.)
Diocese of Tehuacán (erected)
18 February 1962Territory AddedArchdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa (Tuxtepec District) Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
8 October 1972Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (S. Juan Bautista, S. Francisco de Asis, Santa María en Rio Sapo, and S. José Tenango) Territorial Prelature of Huautla (erected)
8 November 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (Pochutla and Pinotepa Nacional along with) Diocese of Puerto Escondido (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
1950890,000900,00098.9%125111366,54415120133ap1951
1959976,000991,44098.4%156121685,80912139133ap1960
19661,210,0001,230,00098.4%141171587,65817194112ap1967
19701,300,0001,325,00098.1%142181608,12520120119ap1971
19761,543,1401,593,14096.9%130271579,82831235130ap1977
19801,492,0001,520,00098.2%136261629,209429235112ap1981
19981,768,7211,944,51791.0%139411809,8261852290130ap2000
19991,900,7302,120,00089.7%1473918610,2181952290130ap2002
20021,365,4392,127,16064.2%152391917,1482159290141ap2003
2003942,4391,657,16056.9%126391655,7112159263113ap2004
2004942,4391,657,16056.9%126391655,7112159268113ap2005
20061,132,0001,415,00080.0%137421796,3242661226111ap2007
20121,246,0001,489,00083.7%148331816,8832335229122ap2013
20151,462,5981,747,06183.7%148371857,9052041205122ap2016
20181,488,9821,778,57683.7%151331848,0922037205123ap2019
20201,504,7391,797,39883.7%150461967,6772048268123ap2021
20221,462,3601,856,63078.8%134381728,5021844142123ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 77
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 138, to Page 139
  • Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 57
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 650, and Page 651
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 469, and Page 470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 21 Jun 2024