Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Felipe Gómez de Angulo

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1676³Born
27 Aug 174468.2SelectedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
28 Sep 174468.3ConfirmedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
30 Aug 174569.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
28 Jul 175276.2DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Diego Felipe Gómez de Angulo
Bishop Diego Felipe Gómez de Angulo (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Spain

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,472
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 85
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 64, Number 296
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,745, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast