Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio de Vizarrón y Eguiarreta

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1682Born
24 Jul 173047.8AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
13 May 173148.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
25 Jan 174764.3DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio de Vizarrón y Eguiarreta
Archbishop Juan Antonio de Vizarrón y Eguiarreta (born , died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto de Santa María, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 50, Number 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,731, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast