Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cubero Ramírez de Arellano, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1671Born
25 Dec 168312.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
9 Jul 173462.6AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
10 Jul 173563.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
20 Jun 175280.5DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for José Cubero Ramírez de Arellano
Bishop José Cubero Ramírez de Arellano O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 228
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018