Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Pardo de Figueroa, O.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1702³BornTinta
30 May 172523.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Minims
11 Jun 172523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
25 Sep 173533.6SelectedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
2 Dec 173533.8ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
9 Sep 173634.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
16 Dec 174341.8AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
2 Feb 175149.0DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pardo de Figueroa:
Archbishop Pedro Pardo de Figueroa O.M. (born Feb 1702, died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,520
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015