Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Montaño y Aarón

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1683Born
19 Jan 173753.8SelectedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
3 Mar 173854.9ConfirmedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
14 Sep 173855.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Oct 174259.6DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Tomás Montaño y Aarón
Bishop Tomás Montaño y Aarón (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,521
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 85
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018