Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Marín Bullón y Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1703BornArroyo de la Luz, Spain
18 Sep 174340.3SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
2 Dec 174340.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
12 Sep 174542.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
19 Jul 174845.1DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Marín Bullón y Figueroa:
Bishop Isidoro Marín Bullón y Figueroa (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 297
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015