Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tehuantepec

Dioecesis Tehuantepecensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Oscar Campos Contreras, Bishop
  • Arturo Lona Reyes, Bishop Emeritus
  • José Refugio Mercado Díaz, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 June 1891
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Oaxaca
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 25,000 (9,656 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Pacífico-Sur
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 93, Mina s/n, 70760 Tehuantepec, Oax., México
  • Telephone: (971)715-00-60
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 June 1891ErectedDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca Diocese of Tehuantepec (erected)
23 May 1959Territory LostDiocese of Tehuantepec
Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla (erected)
21 December 1964Territory LostDiocese of Tehuantepec Territorial Prelature of Mixes (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950500,000520,00096.2%202025,0002732ap1951
1966300,000320,53393.6%18102810,714108521ap1967
1968245,000255,60095.9%2211337,424118517ap1971
1976263,500310,00085.0%2411357,52811311122ap1977
1980361,000424,00085.1%4010507,2201413228ap1981
19901,195,0001,406,00085.0%3884625,9781211432ap1991
19991,124,7941,425,69478.9%5085819,3931310731ap2000
20001,135,6021,441,50278.8%5986716,9491212033ap2001
20011,135,6021,441,50278.8%6787515,1411212033ap2002
20021,145,0001,452,00078.9%5386118,770912233ap2003
20031,250,0001,550,00080.6%6677317,123812735ap2004
20041,320,0001,625,00081.2%6977617,368812238ap2005
20101,355,0001,678,00080.8%5576221,854117849ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 18 Jun 2013