Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla

Dioecesis Sancti Andreae de Tuxtla



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 May 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Veracruz
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 13,495 (5,212 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Golfo
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Constitución y Morelos s/n, 95700 San Andrés Tuxtla, Ver., México
  • Telephone: (294)942-03-74
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 May 1959ErectedDiocese of Tehuantepec
Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla (erected)
9 June 1962Territory LostDiocese of San Andrés Tuxtla Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa) (erected)
Diocese of Veracruz (erected)
14 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of San Andrés Tuxtla Diocese of Coatzacoalcos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966485,394539,21590.0%2953414,27678920ap1967
1970553,500615,24690.0%3443814,565710619ap1971
1976772,000857,79090.0%3824019,300211430ap1977
1980926,0001,060,00087.4%4855317,471610237ap1981
1990639,000723,00088.4%3654115,585356225ap1991
1999856,000892,00096.0%5625814,7582427639ap2000
2000872,000908,00096.0%5926114,2952428140ap2001
2001844,351894,35194.4%7137411,4103238243ap2002
2002921,138968,26695.1%6626813,54631210645ap2003
2003920,138968,26695.0%70168610,69983168746ap2004
2004922,898968,26695.3%6927112,99834211347ap2005
20101,010,0001,085,00093.1%8328511,88233211056ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Mar 2014